22364 Cases | Vandalia Municipal
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVH2300576 | REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | 3/24/2023 | |||||||
WILSON, BEVERLY vs REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | |||||||||
CVH2300574 | REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | 3/24/2023 | |||||||
WHEELER, DARBY vs REGISTRAR, B.M.V. | |||||||||
CVF2300575 | REESE, AALLIYAH | 3/24/2023 | |||||||
FRIENDLY FINANCE CORPORATION C/O RACHEL J MASON ATTY AT LAW vs REESE, AALLIYAH | |||||||||
CVI2300573 | GRIFFITH, JOSH | 3/23/2023 | |||||||
POMPEII, MARIO vs GRIFFITH, JOSH | |||||||||
CVG2300571 | HALL, AMARION | 3/23/2023 | |||||||
PRINCETON MGMT AGT FOR BROOKVIEW PLACE OWNER vs HALL, AMARION | |||||||||
CVG2300572 | MCDONALD, BRITTANY C | 3/23/2023 | |||||||
DIX ROAD PROPERTY MGMT LLC vs MCDONALD, BRITTANY C | |||||||||
CVF2300566 | CLARK, KESHIA | 3/22/2023 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC vs CLARK, KESHIA | |||||||||
CVF2300569 | POPLAR, ANASTASIA | 3/22/2023 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs POPLAR, ANASTASIA | |||||||||
CVG2300564 | FARIS, DAVE | 3/22/2023 | |||||||
METZNER, ANTHONY vs FARIS, DAVE | |||||||||
CVF2300567 | JONES, JENNIFER | 3/22/2023 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE N.A. C/O LYONS DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS vs JONES, JENNIFER | |||||||||
CVF2300570 | CLARK, CIERRA J | 3/22/2023 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs CLARK, CIERRA J | |||||||||
CVG2300565 | PATE, SAMUEL | 3/22/2023 | |||||||
BOTTOM TO THE TOP INV LLC AGT FOR ESTATE FACTORY LLC vs PATE, SAMUEL | |||||||||
CVG2300568 | DIXON, DYESHA | 3/22/2023 | |||||||
HOMERIVER GROUP LLC vs DIXON, DYESHA | |||||||||
CVF2300563 | ROARK, AUDREY | 3/21/2023 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O RESURGENT CAPITAL SER LP vs ROARK, AUDREY | |||||||||
CVF2300562 | SPRENKEL, AUSTIN | 3/21/2023 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs SPRENKEL, AUSTIN | |||||||||
CVG2300553 | HERALD, MAURICE | 3/20/2023 | |||||||
HIGA ENTERPRISES LLC AGT FOR 5600 N MAIN DELAWARE vs HERALD, MAURICE | |||||||||
CVG2300551 | STIGER, APRIL | 3/20/2023 | |||||||
HIGA ENTERPRISES LLC AGT FOR 5600 N MAIN DELAWARE vs STIGER, APRIL | |||||||||
CVG2300554 | HALL, LARRY N | 3/20/2023 | |||||||
DIX ROAD PROPERTY MGMT LLC vs HALL, LARRY N | |||||||||
CVG2300552 | MURPHY, BRITTNEY | 3/20/2023 | |||||||
HIGA ENTERPRISES LLC AGT FOR 5600 N MAIN DELAWARE vs MURPHY, BRITTNEY | |||||||||
1, 2, 3 ... 1117, 1118, 1119 Next |