26225 Cases | Common Pleas Domestic Relations
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2023DM00405 | DANIEL HOWELL | 9/22/2023 | |||||||
Colette Evone Howell vs Daniel Howell | |||||||||
2023DM00406 | JOHNATHAN MACY | 9/22/2023 | |||||||
Laurel Gilbert vs Johnathan MacY | |||||||||
2023DR00659 | HOWARD BRADLEY WASHINGTON | 9/22/2023 | |||||||
Cherri Lee Washington vs Howard Bradley Washington | |||||||||
2023DR00660 | EDINSON CAMACHO GARCIA | 9/22/2023 | |||||||
Laura Dayana Arias Carrasquilla vs Edinson Camacho Garcia | |||||||||
2023DR00657 | ROBERT D BATY | 9/21/2023 | |||||||
Stephanie L. Baty vs Robert D Baty | |||||||||
2023DM00402 | LUCAS DONALD FEGEL | 9/20/2023 | |||||||
Felicia Marie Fegel vs Lucas Donald Fegel | |||||||||
2023DM00403 | KIMBERLY RINGO | 9/20/2023 | |||||||
Charles Ringo Jr vs Kimberly Ringo | |||||||||
2023DM00404 | SHAWN HEFLIN | 9/20/2023 | |||||||
Monica Heflin vs Shawn Heflin | |||||||||
2023DR00652 | ALLISON D. BURGER | 9/20/2023 | |||||||
Nicholas A. Burger vs Allison D. Burger | |||||||||
2023DR00653 | AARON PATRICK JENKINS | 9/20/2023 | |||||||
Bailey Rebecca Jenkins vs Aaron Patrick Jenkins | |||||||||
2023DR00654 | TINA WILSON | 9/20/2023 | |||||||
Matthew Wilson vs Tina Wilson | |||||||||
2023DR00649 | RON J MALINOWSKI | 9/19/2023 | |||||||
Deanna L Malinowski vs Ron J Malinowski | |||||||||
2023DR00650 | MACKENZIE SAYLOR | 9/19/2023 | |||||||
James R. Foister vs MacKenzie Saylor | |||||||||
2023DR00651 | EZEQUIEL SUAREZ GUARDUNO | 9/19/2023 | |||||||
Adriana Sanchez Corona vs Ezequiel Suarez Guarduno | |||||||||
2023DM00400 | GABRIEL MINKEL | 9/18/2023 | |||||||
Mariah Minkel vs Gabriel Minkel | |||||||||
2023DR00646 | MICHAEL DAODU | 9/18/2023 | |||||||
Anthonia Daodu vs Michael Daodu | |||||||||
2023DR00647 | ARLENE MARIELY RODRIGUEZ | 9/18/2023 | |||||||
Juan Santos Suriel vs Arlene Mariely Rodriguez | |||||||||
2023DR00648 | RODNEY SLY | 9/18/2023 | |||||||
Renee Lawson vs Rodney Sly | |||||||||
2023DR00642 | TANYA DENISE JUSTICE | 9/15/2023 | |||||||
Joseph G Justice Iv vs Tanya Denise Justice | |||||||||
1, 2, 3 ... 1310, 1311, 1312 Next |