18837 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2023EST01241 | THE ESTATE OF JOY VANLANDINGHAM | 9/20/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01866 | THE ESTATE OF JEAN YOUNG | 9/20/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01904 | THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL ELKINS | 9/18/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01912 | THE ESTATE OF RONALD KEY | 9/18/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST00844 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIE QUINN | 9/18/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01930 | THE ESTATE OF JUDITH JONES | 9/15/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01873 | THE ESTATE OF HAROLD KNOPP | 9/15/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01867 | THE ESTATE OF MARIAN ALTER | 9/15/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01668 | THE ESTATE OF MARTHA KLINE | 9/15/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01881 | THE ESTATE OF JAMES HOPPER | 9/15/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01721 | THE ESTATE OF CHRISTOPHER SYMES | 9/14/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01751 | THE ESTATE OF JANICE HATCHER | 9/14/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01936 | THE ESTATE OF THOMAS LAMBDIN | 9/14/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01921 | THE ESTATE OF MATTHEW ENDICOTT | 9/13/2023 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01704 | THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL NEWSOME | 9/13/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01891 | THE ESTATE OF HENRY MOORE JR. | 9/12/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01406 | THE ESTATE OF GARY NUMBERS | 9/11/2023 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01455 | THE ESTATE OF JAMES ADAMS | 9/11/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2023EST01827 | THE ESTATE OF JAMES DAVIS | 9/5/2023 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
1, 2, 3 ... 940, 941, 942 Next |