22749 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
25CVV00014 | BMV | 4/11/2025 | |||||||
RYAN PARKER vs BMV | |||||||||
25CVG02652 | SUZY PARKER | 4/10/2025 | |||||||
THE CONNOR GROUP FOR DOVETREE TIC 1 LLC, ET AL 6 vs SUZY PARKER | |||||||||
25CVG02641 | CORINITHIAN WARD | 4/9/2025 | |||||||
GREATER DAYTON PREMIER MANAGEMEN vs CORINITHIAN WARD | |||||||||
25CVG02642 | MICHAEL WILSON | 4/9/2025 | |||||||
GREATER DAYTON PREMIER MANAGEMEN vs MICHAEL WILSON | |||||||||
25CVF02638 | NATAKA LOWERY | 4/8/2025 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO vs NATAKA LOWERY | |||||||||
25CVI02627 | STACEY R SMITH | 4/8/2025 | |||||||
MIAMI VALLEY COLON AND RECTAL SURGEONS vs STACEY R SMITH | |||||||||
25CVG02640 | RAYMOND TYNER SR. | 4/8/2025 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES, INC. FOR NEW HUNTLEY RIDGE, LLC vs RAYMOND TYNER Sr. | |||||||||
25CVI02639 | SODEL TOWNE PROPERTIES | 4/8/2025 | |||||||
S. BRIAN MCBRYDE vs SODEL TOWNE PROPERTIES | |||||||||
25CVF02663 | MICHAELA NICHOLS | 4/8/2025 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs MICHAELA NICHOLS | |||||||||
25CVF02656 | JOSHUA D HAMILTON | 4/7/2025 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK vs JOSHUA D HAMILTON | |||||||||
25CVF02654 | SHERYL BURIANEK | 4/7/2025 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE, N.A. vs SHERYL BURIANEK | |||||||||
25CVF02648 | DANIEL RUCKER | 4/7/2025 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANANGEMENT INC vs DANIEL RUCKER | |||||||||
25CVF02649 | KATHRYN HOLLOWAY | 4/7/2025 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs KATHRYN HOLLOWAY | |||||||||
25CVF02661 | JOHN PORTERFIELD | 4/7/2025 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANGEMENT LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES LLC vs JOHN PORTERFIELD | |||||||||
25CVF02644 | SUSAN G SHAW | 4/7/2025 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OHIO, INC vs SUSAN G SHAW | |||||||||
25CVF02643 | CHEYENNE A JACKSON | 4/7/2025 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OHIO, INC vs CHEYENNE A JACKSON | |||||||||
25CVF02646 | JEFFREY WADE | 4/7/2025 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs JEFFREY WADE | |||||||||
25CVF02645 | REBECCA K SMITH | 4/7/2025 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE, N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS, P vs REBECCA K SMITH | |||||||||
25CVF02659 | THOMAS GRAVES III | 4/7/2025 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK vs THOMAS GRAVES III | |||||||||
1, 2, 3 ... 1136, 1137, 1138 Next |