Daily Law Journal
19106 Cases | Probate
Case Number Defendant Date
2012EST00888 THE ESTATE OF LUDESSA GRIFFIN 5/2/2012
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL
2012EST00879 THE ESTATE OF EVELYN AMOS 5/2/2012
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL
2007GRD00363 THE GUARDIANSHIP OF WILLIAM RITTER III 5/1/2012
GRD: GUARDIANSHIP ADULT INCOMPETENT
2012EST00866 THE ESTATE OF KENNETH WELCH 5/1/2012
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL
2012EST00886 THE ESTATE OF DAVID CAMP, JR. 4/30/2012
EST: FULL ADMIN NO WILL
2012EST00852 THE ESTATE OF JAMES JONES 4/30/2012
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL
2012EST00851 THE ESTATE OF FRED LARUE 4/30/2012
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL
2012EST00574 THE ESTATE OF SHARON THALLS 4/30/2012
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL
2012EST00856 THE ESTATE OF STANLEY LAIRMORE 4/30/2012
EST: FULL ADMIN NO WILL
2012EST00847 THE ESTATE OF ALMA WHITESCARVER 4/30/2012
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL
2012EST00756 THE ESTATE OF GEORGE STAMPER 4/30/2012
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL
2012EST00846 THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM SCHMIDT 4/27/2012
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL
2012EST00853 THE ESTATE OF KIMBERLY DYE 4/27/2012
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL
2012EST00843 THE ESTATE OF ROBERT BAKER 4/26/2012
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL
2012GRD00117 THE GUARDIANSHIP OF HUNTER BREITENSTEIN 4/26/2012
GRD: MINOR INJURY SETTLEMENT NO GUARDIANSHIP
2011EST00070 THE ESTATE OF BETTY WADE 4/26/2012
EST: FULL ADMIN NO WILL
2012EST00804 THE ESTATE OF JAMES WHITE 4/26/2012
EST: FULL ADMIN NO WILL
2012EST00837 THE ESTATE OF WALTER FIDDER JR. 4/26/2012
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL
2008GRD00090 THE GUARDIANSHIP OF NANCY MORTON 4/26/2012
GRD: SUCCESSOR LIFE ESSENTIALS-INDIGENT

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 947, 948, 949 ... 954, 955, 956  Next