Daily Law Journal
15509 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number Defendant Date
14CVH00376 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR 3/19/2014
ERNIE HASTY JR vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR
14CVF00370 JIMMY WALLER 3/18/2014
ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC vs JIMMY WALLER
14CVF00372 GREGORY KIRCHNER 3/18/2014
SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES OF OHIO, INC vs GREGORY KIRCHNER
14CVF00373 CASSIDY R. WEIKERT 3/18/2014
ROSS RENTALS DBA ORCHARD GLEN APARTMENTS vs CASSIDY R. WEIKERT
14CVG00365 JEFFREY BAYLOR, ET AL 3/18/2014
CAMBRIDGE COMMONS APTS vs JEFFREY BAYLOR, ET AL
14CVG00366 SUZANNE GIBSON, ET AL. 3/18/2014
CAMBRIDGE COMMONS APTS vs SUZANNE GIBSON, ET AL.
14CVG00367 AMY LANGDON, ET AL 3/18/2014
ELON PROPERTY MANAGEMENT vs AMY LANGDON, ET AL
14CVG00368 LEIF GRIESHOP, ET AL 3/18/2014
CAMBRIDGE COMMONS APTS vs LEIF GRIESHOP, ET AL
14CVG00369 LATOYA ROBINSON, ET AL 3/18/2014
CAMBRIDGE COMMONS APTS vs LATOYA ROBINSON, ET AL
14CVI00371 KAY COOK 3/18/2014
PAULA R LANDIS vs KAY COOK
14CVF00360 ALISHA GIBSON 3/17/2014
NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2005-1 vs ALISHA GIBSON
14CVH00364 MIKE RANKIN, REG 3/17/2014
GERALDINE E STEVENS vs MIKE RANKIN, REG
14CVG00363 CADITTA HIATT 3/17/2014
DAYTON SPRING VALLEY PARTNERS, L DBA PRESERVE AT SAGEBROOK vs CADITTA HIATT
14CVF00362 TRACEY PETERMAN 3/17/2014
ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC vs TRACEY PETERMAN
14CVF00361 LATASHA ADKINS, ET AL. 3/17/2014
KETTERING HEALTH NETWORK CREDIT UNION vs LATASHA ADKINS, ET AL.
14CVF00359 DAVID L LASCHITZ 3/14/2014
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES LLC vs DAVID L LASCHITZ
14CVG00357 RICARDO BELTON 3/14/2014
TAMARA JONES C/O COLDWELL BANKERS - HERITAGE vs RICARDO BELTON
14CVI00358 AUTO CONNECTION C/O GREG MAXEY & LENA LEWIS 3/14/2014
INTERSTATE BATTERIES OF GREATER vs AUTO CONNECTION C/O GREG MAXEY & LENA LEWIS
14CVF00353 MARCUS D. BURKS 3/13/2014
SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES OF OHIO, INC. vs MARCUS D. BURKS

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 763, 764, 765 ... 774, 775, 776  Next