11234 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
17CVF00510 | DANITA RICHARDSON AKA DANITA G. RICHARDSON | 7/5/2017 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL OF OHIO, INC. vs DANITA RICHARDSON AKA DANITA G. RICHARDSON | |||||||||
17CVF00533 | DEBORAH A. HUDSON AKA DEBORAH HUDSON | 7/5/2017 | |||||||
CAPTIAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES, LLC vs DEBORAH A. HUDSON AKA DEB... | |||||||||
17CVF00573 | JIMMIE CLARK | 7/5/2017 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs JIMMIE CLARK | |||||||||
17CVF00589 | RICHARD P. KNOTT | 7/5/2017 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES, LLC vs RICHARD P. KNOTT | |||||||||
17CVF00598 | JAMMIE SCHNEIDER | 7/5/2017 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs JAMMIE SCHNEIDER | |||||||||
17CVF00503 | CLAIRE NORVELL | 7/5/2017 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK C/O ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, PC vs CLAIRE NORVELL | |||||||||
17CVF00515 | TREYVON FLOOD | 7/3/2017 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs TREYVON FLOOD | |||||||||
16CVI01358 | MAURICE ROBINSON | 6/28/2017 | |||||||
VIRGINIA E. LYNN vs MAURICE ROBINSON | |||||||||
17CVG00468 | LINDSEY WILSON, ET. AL | 6/28/2017 | |||||||
BEVERLY BRIGGS vs LINDSEY WILSON, ET. AL | |||||||||
16CVG01542 | ASHLEY SEWARD, ET. AL | 6/28/2017 | |||||||
STEVE KRENNING vs ASHLEY SEWARD, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVF00092 | NANCY STAMM | 6/27/2017 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs NANCY STAMM | |||||||||
17CVF00142 | ELIZABETH VIRGIN, AKA ELIZABETH M. BRASIE | 6/26/2017 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs ELIZABETH VIRGIN, AKA ELIZABETH M. BRASIE | |||||||||
17CVF00484 | MOHAMMED J. MOHANNA | 6/26/2017 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs MOHAMMED J. MOHANNA | |||||||||
17CVF00599 | TRACEY WILLIAMSON | 6/26/2017 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL OF OHIO, INC., vs TRACEY WILLIAMSON | |||||||||
17CVF00705 | ROBBIN R. RADER BROWN | 6/26/2017 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES, LLC vs ROBBIN R. RADER BROWN | |||||||||
17CVF00728 | OROZCO ANDREA | 6/26/2017 | |||||||
COMENITY BANK vs OROZCO ANDREA | |||||||||
17CVF00120 | CHRISTOPHER L HARRIS | 6/23/2017 | |||||||
STERLING JEWELERS INC. DBA JARED-GALLERIA OF JEWELRY vs CHRISTOPHER L HARRIS | |||||||||
17CVF00200 | JAMES D. CULLUM | 6/23/2017 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC. LLC ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A. vs JAMES D. CULLUM | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 470, 471, 472 ... 560, 561, 562 Next |