Daily Law Journal
9603 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number Defendant Date
14CVF00946 R.K. CONSTRUCTION, INC. RANDY D. KING, STAT AGENT 10/14/2014
ROOFTEK ROOFING SUPPLIES, INC. vs R.K. CONSTRUCTION, INC. RANDY D. KING, STAT AGENT
14CVF01001 LINDA M COLAS 10/14/2014
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs LINDA M COLAS
14CVH01516 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR 10/14/2014
JESSICA A KNIGHT vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR
14CVF00345 KENNETH GILL 10/14/2014
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs KENNETH GILL
14CVF01012 CAROLYN ALCORN 10/13/2014
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs CAROLYN ALCORN
14CVF01177 SUSAN K CLARK 10/13/2014
COMPETITIVE EDGE ATHLETICS, INC vs SUSAN K CLARK
14CVG00120 MICHAEL LINVILLE 10/9/2014
RONIULLO BARBECHO AND JAMIR BARBECHO vs MICHAEL LINVILLE
14CVG00058 PAUL NEFF 10/7/2014
PAG HOLDINGS, LTD. vs PAUL NEFF
14CVF01240 PASQUALE M BRUNO 10/2/2014
WRIGHT PATT CREDIT UNION vs PASQUALE M BRUNO
14CVF01238 JACOB WILLIAMS 10/2/2014
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs JACOB WILLIAMS
14CVF01235 ANGELA MOORE 10/2/2014
DESTIN TOOP vs ANGELA MOORE
14CVF01191 CONNIE FUCHS 10/2/2014
AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK C/O ZWICKER & ASSOC, PC vs CONNIE FUCHS
14CVF01181 TROY D MEYERS 10/2/2014
WILLOW GREEN CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC vs TROY D MEYERS
14CVF01163 AMANDA IMES 10/2/2014
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES LLC vs AMANDA IMES
14CVF01156 JERMAINE ESSEX 10/2/2014
RENT-A-CENTER, INC vs JERMAINE ESSEX
14CVF01123 STEVE VANCE 10/2/2014
AUTOVEST, LLC C/O SLOVIN & ASSOCIATES CO. LPA vs STEVE VANCE
14CVF00180 MELISSA G. YAHLE 10/2/2014
ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC vs MELISSA G. YAHLE
14CVF00166 RHONDA SMITH 10/2/2014
ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC vs RHONDA SMITH
14CVF00109 SUSAN JAISLE 10/2/2014
ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC vs SUSAN JAISLE

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 469, 470, 471 ... 479, 480, 481  Next