11234 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
17CVF00668 | AUSTIN C. HUNTER | 7/18/2017 | |||||||
CBCS vs AUSTIN C. HUNTER | |||||||||
17CVF00774 | HUBERT R. DAVIS | 7/18/2017 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) , NA vs HUBERT R. DAVIS | |||||||||
17CVF00775 | CHARLES C. EVANS | 7/18/2017 | |||||||
CBCS vs CHARLES C. EVANS | |||||||||
17CVF00778 | SARAH FITTON-LING | 7/18/2017 | |||||||
RIVER VALLEY CREDIT UNION INC. vs SARAH FITTON-LING | |||||||||
17CVI00394 | ELVIN (AUSTIN) R. BOWMAN | 7/18/2017 | |||||||
JAMES CULLERS vs ELVIN (AUSTIN) R. BOWMAN | |||||||||
17CVF00604 | JANA R. JONES | 7/18/2017 | |||||||
CBCS vs JANA R. JONES | |||||||||
16CVF01181 | AMANDA HORNUNG AKA AMANDA M. HORNUNG | 7/12/2017 | |||||||
ACCESS GROUP INC. vs AMANDA HORNUNG AKA AMANDA M. HORNUNG | |||||||||
17CVF00212 | RON TURNER | 7/12/2017 | |||||||
CONSOLIDATED IV, LLC DBA THE KNOLLS APARTMENTS vs RON TURNER | |||||||||
17CVF00383 | REBECCA S. BERRY | 7/12/2017 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES, LLC vs REBECCA S. BERRY | |||||||||
17CVI00713 | DONALD YOUTSEY | 7/11/2017 | |||||||
ASTORIA HEALTH & REHAB vs DONALD YOUTSEY | |||||||||
17CVG00380 | JORDAN MORRIS, ET. AL | 7/11/2017 | |||||||
CONSOLIDATED IV, LLC. DBA THE KNOLLS APARTMENTS vs JORDAN MORRIS, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVF00221 | ANN EWING | 7/10/2017 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs ANN EWING | |||||||||
17CVF00726 | JAMIE L. WAYMAN | 7/10/2017 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs JAMIE L. WAYMAN | |||||||||
17CVF00761 | BRENDA M. BACK | 7/10/2017 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL OF OHIO INC. vs BRENDA M. BACK | |||||||||
17CVF00795 | JOSH JAMES REFFITT | 7/10/2017 | |||||||
AURGROUP FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION vs JOSH JAMES REFFITT | |||||||||
17CVF00876 | HOWARD L. CLODGO | 7/10/2017 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC. vs HOWARD L. CLODGO | |||||||||
16CVF01168 | JAMES WALSH | 7/5/2017 | |||||||
CYPRESS FINANCIAL RECOVERIES, LLC vs JAMES WALSH | |||||||||
17CVF00006 | STEPHANIE M. HUMPHREY | 7/5/2017 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs STEPHANIE M. HUMPHREY | |||||||||
17CVF00137 | BENJAMIN S. ALFORD | 7/5/2017 | |||||||
CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC. vs BENJAMIN S. ALFORD | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 468, 469, 470 ... 560, 561, 562 Next |