Daily Law Journal
8643 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number Defendant Date
14CVF01580 JULIUS HALL 1/23/2015
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs JULIUS HALL
14CVI01850 BERLIS V. PREYOR 1/22/2015
JOAN MOORE vs BERLIS V. PREYOR
14CVF01712 SARAH MIX 1/16/2015
RADIOLOGY PHYSICIANS INC. C/O SLOVIN & ASSOCIATE CO. LPA vs SARAH MIX
14CVF01704 MARY HINESMAN 1/16/2015
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs MARY HINESMAN
14CVF01696 JONATHAN C RIKE 1/16/2015
CODE CREDIT UNION, INC. AN OHIO NON-PROFIT CORPORATION vs JONATHAN C RIKE
14CVF01687 AARON TAYLOR 1/16/2015
SECURITY CREDIT SERVICES, LLC vs AARON TAYLOR
14CVF01673 ALLEN K JEFFERY 1/16/2015
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs ALLEN K JEFFERY
14CVF01530 ADAM C. WARD 1/16/2015
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs ADAM C. WARD
14CVF01473 MICHAEL HOPKINS 1/16/2015
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs MICHAEL HOPKINS
14CVF00873 STEPHANIE M MORTER 1/16/2015
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs STEPHANIE M MORTER
14CVF00782 LESA HUNTER 1/16/2015
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs LESA HUNTER
07CVH01156 DOROTHY JONES 1/14/2015
CAPITAL ONE BANK vs DOROTHY JONES
08CVH02826 CRAIG R. COPHER 1/14/2015
ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES vs CRAIG R. COPHER
09CVH00216 RYAN SMITH 1/14/2015
HILCO RECEIVABLES, LLC vs RYAN SMITH
14CVF01128 MICHAEL WSZEBOROWSKI 1/13/2015
SUNDANCE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT vs MICHAEL WSZEBOROWSKI
14CVF01536 JOSHUA HALL 1/13/2015
JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIE vs JOSHUA HALL
07CVF00051 SHERRYL L. TIMSON 1/9/2015
FRIENDLY FINANCE CORP vs SHERRYL L. TIMSON
14CVF00381 KATHRYN HILL 1/9/2015
ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC vs KATHRYN HILL
14CVF00599 BAILEY SMITH 1/9/2015
DISCOVER BANK vs BAILEY SMITH

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 409, 410, 411 ... 431, 432, 433  Next