11344 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
20CVF00555 | SHANAEY JONES | 8/18/2020 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSSTEMS, LLC vs SHANAEY JONES | |||||||||
20CVF00511 | CHAD BALL | 8/18/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. vs CHAD BALL | |||||||||
20CVF00755 | AMBER SWEENEY | 8/17/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs AMBER SWEENEY | |||||||||
20CVF00607 | CHRISTOPHER G BERTA | 8/14/2020 | |||||||
CBCS vs CHRISTOPHER G BERTA | |||||||||
20CVG00423 | GERALD PEARSON SR. | 8/12/2020 | |||||||
KENNETH D BELVO vs GERALD PEARSON SR. | |||||||||
19CVF02154 | DAVID MOORE | 8/11/2020 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs DAVID MOORE | |||||||||
20CVF00799 | CYNTHIA BOYKIN | 8/11/2020 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs CYNTHIA BOYKIN | |||||||||
20CVF00176 | CHRISTINE KOVERMAN | 8/11/2020 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs CHRISTINE KOVERMAN | |||||||||
20CVF00174 | AMY JEFFERY | 8/11/2020 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs AMY JEFFERY | |||||||||
20CVF00155 | PHILLIP PLANCK | 8/11/2020 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs PHILLIP PLANCK | |||||||||
19CVF02149 | KAREN SWEENEY | 8/11/2020 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs KAREN SWEENEY | |||||||||
19CVF02148 | SARA FRANK | 8/11/2020 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs SARA FRANK | |||||||||
19CVF02145 | IVAN POWELL | 8/11/2020 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs IVAN POWELL | |||||||||
19CVF02082 | JOYCE NUNLEY AKA JOYCE A. HERMAN | 8/11/2020 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs JOYCE NUNLEY AKA JOYCE A. HERMAN | |||||||||
19CVF01285 | ROY STANDAFER | 8/11/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs ROY STANDAFER | |||||||||
19CVF00769 | DOWNAJOE WORISCHECK | 7/28/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs DOWNAJOE WORISCHECK | |||||||||
20CVF00556 | RICK S. MERRITT | 7/28/2020 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs RICK S. MERRITT | |||||||||
20CVF00601 | MARVIN K. BARNETT | 7/28/2020 | |||||||
RUSCHAU & LEHMAN ATTORNEYS AT LAW vs MARVIN K. BARNETT | |||||||||
20CVF00306 | CATRINA L. HAGERTY | 7/27/2020 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs CATRINA L. HAGERTY | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 339, 340, 341 ... 566, 567, 568 Next |