9258 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVF2400153 | BUTLER, MICHELLE | 4/16/2024 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs BUTLER, MICHELLE | |||||||||
CVF2301514 | HOBDY, DUSTIN | 4/16/2024 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs HOBDY, DUSTIN | |||||||||
CVF2400347 | PHILPOT, AMELIA K | 4/16/2024 | |||||||
OHIO UNIVERSITY vs PHILPOT, AMELIA K | |||||||||
CVF2301634 | BRODEK, JUANITA | 4/16/2024 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES vs BRODEK, JUANITA | |||||||||
CVF2300361 | TARHAN, XENA | 4/16/2024 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs TARHAN, XENA | |||||||||
CVF2301290 | ZINK, CARMEN | 4/16/2024 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK vs ZINK, CARMEN | |||||||||
CVF2300828 | HOWELL, RYAN D | 4/16/2024 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE NA vs HOWELL, RYAN D | |||||||||
CVG2400552 | GRUBB, DARRYL K | 4/16/2024 | |||||||
GRUBB, JEFFREY J vs GRUBB, DARRYL K | |||||||||
CVF2300820 | GILLMAN, JODI E | 4/16/2024 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK vs GILLMAN, JODI E | |||||||||
CVF2301483 | DOYLE, RHONDA G | 4/16/2024 | |||||||
KH CREDIT UNION vs DOYLE, RHONDA G | |||||||||
CVF2301477 | MCCULLAR, DAVID G | 4/16/2024 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs MCCULLAR, DAVID G | |||||||||
CVF2400240 | TEAKELL, MELISSA D | 4/15/2024 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES vs TEAKELL, MELISSA D | |||||||||
CVF2400371 | MICHAELS, SUSAN | 4/11/2024 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs MICHAELS, SUSAN | |||||||||
CVF2400175 | JONES, DUSTIN | 4/11/2024 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV 1, LLC vs JONES, DUSTIN | |||||||||
CVG2400497 | HONEYCUTT, DONALD | 4/10/2024 | |||||||
SUN SECURED FINANCING LLC vs HONEYCUTT, DONALD | |||||||||
CVF2400297 | JETT, DIANA | 4/10/2024 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs JETT, DIANA | |||||||||
CVG2400495 | ORTEGA, ROSA | 4/10/2024 | |||||||
SUN SECURED FINANCING LLC vs ORTEGA, ROSA | |||||||||
CVF2301851 | ADKINS, COLLIN | 4/9/2024 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MGMT INC vs ADKINS, COLLIN | |||||||||
CVF2400031 | ALKANAWI, SALIH | 4/9/2024 | |||||||
U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs ALKANAWI, SALIH | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3, ... 461, 462, 463 Next |