10122 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
23CVF03980 | AMY L CHILCOTE | 4/8/2024 | |||||||
TRIHEALTH INC C/O RACHEL J MASON vs AMY L CHILCOTE | |||||||||
24CVF02104 | DANIEL L TAYLOR | 4/8/2024 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC. vs DANIEL L TAYLOR | |||||||||
23CVF04005 | CASSANDRA J COLLEIN | 4/4/2024 | |||||||
EAGLE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC. vs CASSANDRA J COLLEIN | |||||||||
24CVF02161 | SHAM REDDY | 4/4/2024 | |||||||
THE LAW OFFICE OF JEFFREY D. SLY vs SHAM REDDY | |||||||||
24CVF02280 | JON M ADKINS | 4/3/2024 | |||||||
JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS, P vs JON M ADKINS | |||||||||
23CVF03456 | TYLER R BARKER | 4/1/2024 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC vs TYLER R BARKER | |||||||||
23CVF02944 | MARY CARTER | 4/1/2024 | |||||||
H & S FINANCIAL, INC vs MARY CARTER | |||||||||
23CVF02281 | TYLER STEELE | 4/1/2024 | |||||||
ERIC G COATES vs TYLER STEELE | |||||||||
23CVF03313 | EAT MORE CAKE | 4/1/2024 | |||||||
SPARTAN PLUMBING LLC vs EAT MORE CAKE | |||||||||
24CVF02010 | BARBARA A CHAMPEN | 4/1/2024 | |||||||
GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, C/O SLOVIN & ASSOCIATES CO. LPA vs BARBARA A CHA... | |||||||||
24CVF02062 | GERARD S JARVIS | 4/1/2024 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC vs GERARD S JARVIS | |||||||||
23CVF03882 | HARVEY RIDLEY | 4/1/2024 | |||||||
LENDMARK FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC vs HARVEY RIDLEY | |||||||||
24CVF02139 | KENNETH W JOHNSON | 4/1/2024 | |||||||
EAGLE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. vs KENNETH W JOHNSON | |||||||||
23CVF04080 | ARROW L. NOOKS | 3/28/2024 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO vs ARROW L. NOOKS | |||||||||
23CVF03582 | SHERRI VOLKERT | 3/28/2024 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, N.A. C/O TARGET ENTERPRISE, INC vs SHERRI VOLKERT | |||||||||
23CVF04098 | NIKOLAS R DAULTON | 3/28/2024 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES L vs NIKOLAS R DAULTON | |||||||||
23CVF03771 | ADRAIN A ESPINO | 3/26/2024 | |||||||
MARINER FINANCE LLC vs ADRAIN A ESPINO | |||||||||
24CVF02047 | JAMES MCLEAN | 3/26/2024 | |||||||
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION, INC vs JAMES MCLEAN | |||||||||
23CVF03845 | KYRIECE R FOREST | 3/25/2024 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO vs KYRIECE R FOREST | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3, 4 ... 505, 506, 507 Next |