17257 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
25CVF02069 | SHIANNE NASH | 4/28/2025 | |||||||
LENDMARK FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC vs SHIANNE NASH | |||||||||
25CVF02074 | TIMOTHY JONES | 4/28/2025 | |||||||
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION, INC. vs TIMOTHY JONES | |||||||||
25CVF02284 | RHONDA L JACKSON | 4/28/2025 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. vs RHONDA L JACKSON | |||||||||
25CVF02073 | TRENT HOGUE | 4/28/2025 | |||||||
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION, INC. vs TRENT HOGUE | |||||||||
24CVF02205 | MICHAEL BOWMAN | 4/25/2025 | |||||||
VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC vs MICHAEL BOWMAN | |||||||||
25CVF02068 | MANUEL LARA | 4/25/2025 | |||||||
LENDMARK FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC vs MANUEL LARA | |||||||||
25CVF02106 | BRIAN REED | 4/25/2025 | |||||||
CEP AMERICA OHIO LLC c/o WITKES LAW FIRM, LLC vs BRIAN REED | |||||||||
24CVF04205 | JORDAN R ESSEX | 4/25/2025 | |||||||
WASHINGTON PLACE c/o HEYMAN LAW, LLC vs JORDAN R ESSEX | |||||||||
24CVF03552 | SAED KHALED | 4/24/2025 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. vs SAED KHALED | |||||||||
24CVF03226 | DANIELLE S WHITE | 4/24/2025 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs DANIELLE S WHITE | |||||||||
24CVI04239 | DAYTON ROOFING SOLUTIONS LLC MICHAEL CHESBROUGH | 4/24/2025 | |||||||
DAKOTA HEIM vs DAYTON ROOFING SOLUTIONS LLC MICHAEL CHESBROUGH | |||||||||
24CVF02677 | SHEILA B OWSLEY | 4/23/2025 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs SHEILA B OWSLEY | |||||||||
24CVF04247 | TOTAL TRAVEL SYSTEM, LTD., TOTAL TRAVEL SYSTEM, LT... | 4/23/2025 | |||||||
ROBERT K. JONES INSURANCE AGENCY vs TOTAL TRAVEL SYSTEM, LTD., TOTAL TRAVEL SYSTEM, L... | |||||||||
15CVF02094 | DAVID W SCHRODER | 4/22/2025 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs DAVID W SCHRODER | |||||||||
25CVI02425 | STEPHANIE PALMER | 4/22/2025 | |||||||
ANTHONY PALMER vs STEPHANIE PALMER | |||||||||
24CVI04156 | TERRI BETH SMITH | 4/22/2025 | |||||||
RICHARD SNYDER, PENDRA SNYDER vs TERRI BETH SMITH | |||||||||
25CVG02499 | JEREMIAH MARSCHALL | 4/22/2025 | |||||||
DIX ROAD PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC vs JEREMIAH MARSCHALL | |||||||||
25CVG02620 | DAVID BOROUGHS | 4/22/2025 | |||||||
HMA ALLURE, LLC C/O WILLIS LAW FIRM LLC vs DAVID BOROUGHS | |||||||||
25CVG02640 | RAYMOND TYNER SR. | 4/22/2025 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES, INC. FOR NEW HUNTLEY RIDGE, LLC vs RAYMOND TYNER Sr. | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3, 4 ... 861, 862, 863 Next |