15020 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
23CVI03523 | PRODUCTION CONSTRUCTION, INC ET ALL | 12/12/2023 | |||||||
ALTAFIBER C/O MCCASLIN vs PRODUCTION CONSTRUCTION, INC ET ALL | |||||||||
23CVG03916 | JOSHUA GANT | 12/12/2023 | |||||||
BRG REALTY GROUP, LLC FOR DEP WYNDS APARTMENTS LLC vs JOSHUA GANT | |||||||||
23CVG03918 | THOMAS SHORT, JOSEPHINE BAKER, MOLLY PEYTON | 12/12/2023 | |||||||
PRINCETON MANAGEMENT, LLC vs THOMAS SHORT, JOSEPHINE BAKER, MOLLY PEYTON | |||||||||
23CVF03177 | APRIL G REED | 12/8/2023 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, N.A. C/O TARGET ENTERPRISE, INC vs APRIL G REED | |||||||||
23CVF03002 | WILLENA J COTTERMAN | 12/8/2023 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, N.A. C/O TARGET ENTERPRISE, INC vs WILLENA J COTTERMAN | |||||||||
23CVF03593 | ROCHELLE FIELDS | 12/8/2023 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. vs ROCHELLE FIELDS | |||||||||
23CVF02575 | BRANDON MCCLURE | 12/8/2023 | |||||||
HEETER PLUMBING LLC vs BRANDON MCCLURE | |||||||||
23CVI03615 | AMERICAN PRIDE LAWN & LANDSCAPIN | 12/7/2023 | |||||||
GEORGE STEBERL vs AMERICAN PRIDE LAWN & LANDSCAPIN | |||||||||
23CVI03392 | PHENIX MEDIA & ZEN BUSINESS INC | 12/7/2023 | |||||||
UNBELIEVABULLS vs PHENIX MEDIA & ZEN BUSINESS INC | |||||||||
23CVF02565 | JENNIFER B HURSEY | 12/7/2023 | |||||||
STEVE RAUCH, INC vs JENNIFER B HURSEY | |||||||||
23CVV00004 | BMV | 12/6/2023 | |||||||
PATRICK BUCCI vs BMV | |||||||||
23CVG03875 | PRIANNA SMITH | 12/5/2023 | |||||||
COASTAL RIDGE REAL ESTATE PARTNE (GATEWAY LOFTS) vs PRIANNA SMITH | |||||||||
23CVG03870 | TOYA THOMAS | 12/5/2023 | |||||||
COASTAL RIDGE REAL ESTATE PARTNE (GATEWAY LOFTS) vs TOYA THOMAS | |||||||||
23CVG03857 | KIMBERLY BENNINGTON | 12/5/2023 | |||||||
GREGORY J MARTIN vs KIMBERLY BENNINGTON | |||||||||
23CVG03863 | DERRICKO HALL AND CHAZ LAWREY | 12/5/2023 | |||||||
C & D PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC vs DERRICKO HALL AND CHAZ LAWREY | |||||||||
23CVG03876 | KAYLA BROWN | 12/5/2023 | |||||||
COASTAL RIDGE REAL ESTATE PARTNE (GATEWAY LOFTS) vs KAYLA BROWN | |||||||||
23CVG03856 | CARLI KING | 12/5/2023 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES INC FOR KETTERING 47 LLC vs CARLI KING | |||||||||
23CVG03867 | CEDRICK MARTIN | 12/5/2023 | |||||||
MILLENIA HOUSING MANAGMENT LTD (GATEWAY AT THE GREENE vs CEDRICK MARTIN | |||||||||
23CVG03864 | LUIS RUIZ | 12/5/2023 | |||||||
COASTAL RIDGE REAL ESTATE PARTNE (GATEWAY LOFTS) vs LUIS RUIZ | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3, ... 749, 750, 751 Next |