Daily Law Journal
12065 Cases | Mont. County Municipal Assignments
Case Number Defendant Date
2013CVG00651 ANGELA MCDONALD 8/21/2013
CSA ASSOCIATES A PARTNERSHIP vs ANGELA MCDONALD
2013CVG00684 STAR ANDERSON, ET AL 8/21/2013
GARY WHITAKER vs STAR ANDERSON, ET AL
2013CVG00679 KIMBLE WALLER, ET AL 8/21/2013
WESTBROOKE VILLAGE APTS vs KIMBLE WALLER, ET AL
2013CVI00372 MIDAS AUTO SALES 8/19/2013
LESTER & LASHANDA LA SMITH vs MIDAS AUTO SALES
2013CVG00686 CANDIS R BROWN 8/19/2013
KOFI A ANIM vs CANDIS R BROWN
2013CVI00581 PESTER PLUMBING 8/19/2013
CHERYL LEWIS vs PESTER PLUMBING
2013CVF00068 BROWNINGS AUTO SALES AND MR AND/OR MRS DOE 8/16/2013
ANGELA K PENNINGTON and PAUL PENNINGTON vs BROWNINGS AUTO SALES and MR AND/OR MRS DOE
2013CVF00248 CEME, LLC DBA BANK SHOTS AND MARK B EWART 8/16/2013
ERB POULTRY, INC. vs CEME, LLC DBA BANK SHOTS and MARK B EWART
2013CVG00477 ANGELA NEWTON 8/15/2013
SCHOENFELD INVESTMENTS LLC vs ANGELA NEWTON
2012CVF01031 CORNELIA GULLETTE 8/15/2013
REALMARK CORP vs CORNELIA GULLETTE
2013CVG00667 TYLER JONES 8/15/2013
FINSILVER/FRIEDMAN MANAGEMENT CORPORATION AS RECEIVER FOR AMHURST APARTMENTS vs TYLER...
2013CVG00668 DARNEEN JOHNSON 8/15/2013
FINSILVER/FRIEDMAN MANAGEMENT CORPORATION AS RECEIVER FOR AMHURST APARTMENTS vs DARNE...
2012CVF00726 CHRISTIE GREENE 8/15/2013
ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC vs CHRISTIE GREENE
2013CVG00664 ROBIN BATTLE 8/15/2013
KAREN WOOTEN vs ROBIN BATTLE
2013CVG00663 CHRISTINA WARFE 8/15/2013
KAREN WOOTEN vs CHRISTINA WARFE
2013CVG00666 LORI PEAK 8/15/2013
OVERLOOK MUTUAL HOMES, INC vs LORI PEAK
2013CVG00665 DOUGLAS REEDER 8/15/2013
OVERLOOK MUTUAL HOMES, INC. vs DOUGLAS REEDER
2013CVG00671 NIOCA MANLEY, ET AL 8/14/2013
WESTBROOKE VILLAGE APTS. vs NIOCA MANLEY, ET AL

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 596, 597, 598 ... 602, 603, 604  Next