Daily Law Journal
3395 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number Defendant Date
15CVI03039 MEGAN HARKER 2/16/2016
AK LAWN & LANDSCAPE, LLC vs MEGAN HARKER
15CVF02060 MARCO CHAMBERS AND TERRI CHAMBERS 2/16/2016
TENDER LOVING CHIILDCARE CENTER, vs MARCO CHAMBERS and TERRI CHAMBERS
16CVG02068 MICHELLE SMITH 2/16/2016
HUNTLEY RIDGE LLC vs MICHELLE SMITH
16CVG02059 KEVIN SMITH AND ANGELEAH SMITH 2/16/2016
THIRTY 43 BY THE GREENE vs KEVIN SMITH and ANGELEAH SMITH
16CVG02054 THOMAS HUBBARD 2/16/2016
ARM & T HOLDINGS, LLC vs THOMAS HUBBARD
16CVG02050 JAMES E GUSEMAN AND DEBORAH GUSEMAN 2/16/2016
SHIRLEY CRISWELL vs JAMES E GUSEMAN and DEBORAH GUSEMAN
15CVG03044 ABRAHAM RAYBURN 2/16/2016
KIMBERLY P THACKER vs ABRAHAM RAYBURN
14CVF02445 GEORGE BERRY 2/16/2016
CHRISTINE DOBRAN Dr vs GEORGE BERRY
15CVF02256 TERRANCE WRIGHT 2/16/2016
WILLIAMSON LAWN CARE LLC vs TERRANCE WRIGHT
15CVF02739 OLIVER STOUTNER 2/16/2016
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs OLIVER STOUTNER
15CVE02609 PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE AND JASMINE FREIJE 2/16/2016
KORI A ROTH vs PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE and JASMINE FREIJE
16CVV00011 DON PETIT OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES 2/12/2016
TYLER VICE vs DON PETIT OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES
15CVF02396 OHIO IRRIGATION LAWN SPRINKLER SYSTEMS INC 2/12/2016
VISUAL CAPTURE vs OHIO IRRIGATION LAWN SPRINKLER SYSTEMS INC
16CVV00008 BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR 2/11/2016
CLINT BACKUS vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR
15CVV00198 REGISTRAR BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICL 2/11/2016
ZACHARY A CASTOR vs REGISTRAR BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICL
16CVV00007 BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR 2/10/2016
JACOB MALOTT vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR
15CVF02260 WILLA L SINGER 2/9/2016
BANK OF AMERICA N.A. C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES LLC vs WILLA L SINGER
15CVF02261 WILLA L SINGER 2/9/2016
BANK OF AMERICA N.A. C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES LLC vs WILLA L SINGER
15CVF02825 MICHAEL CARR 2/9/2016
CACH, LLC vs MICHAEL CARR

1, 2, 3 ... 168, 169, 170  Next