Daily Law Journal
5144 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number Defendant Date
20CVF00384 KEVIN A. CALHOUN 9/11/2020
TRACIR FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. vs KEVIN A. CALHOUN
20CVF00876 LATRICIA A. KEITH AKA LATRICIA A. KEITH 9/10/2020
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs LATRICIA A. KEITH AKA LATRICIA A. KEITH
20CVI00838 CHARLOTTE KOZLOWSKI 9/10/2020
GERALD GUNNOE vs CHARLOTTE KOZLOWSKI
20CVF00476 CERA HUMERICK 9/8/2020
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. vs CERA HUMERICK
19CVF02196 NATHANIEL R. FUGATE 9/8/2020
HS FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC vs NATHANIEL R. FUGATE
20CVF00237 MARCEDES I. BURGE 9/8/2020
SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC. vs MARCEDES I. BURGE
19CVF02018 TRISHA A. MOYER 9/8/2020
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs TRISHA A. MOYER
20CVF00478 JUSTIN VENEY 9/8/2020
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. vs JUSTIN VENEY
19CVF02261 GREGORY P. STECHYSHYN 9/8/2020
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING DE, vs GREGORY P. STECHYSHYN
20CVF00304 LYDIA J. BARDUA 9/4/2020
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs LYDIA J. BARDUA
20CVF00188 JAMES RAGON 9/2/2020
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs JAMES RAGON
19CVF01922 OTIS MITCHELL, JR. AKA OTIS H. MITCHELL, JR. 9/2/2020
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs OTIS MITCHELL, JR. AKA OTIS H. MITCHELL, JR.
20CVF00207 DERICK TAYLOR 9/2/2020
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC vs DERICK TAYLOR
19CVF02232 GREGORY P. STECHYSHYN 9/2/2020
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. vs GREGORY P. STECHYSHYN
19CVF01470 STEPHANIE J. MIRANDA 9/2/2020
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELHUIS PC vs STEPHANIE J. MIRA...
20CVF00212 MORRIS THOMPSON 9/2/2020
US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs MORRIS THOMPSON
20CVF00197 JAZZMINN HARVEY 9/2/2020
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs JAZZMINN HARVEY
19CVF02120 BERTHA JOHNSON 9/2/2020
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) , N.A. vs BERTHA JOHNSON
19CVF01106 LESLIEANN JOHNSON 9/2/2020
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs LESLIEANN JOHNSON

1, 2, 3 ... 256, 257, 258  Next