Daily Law Journal
12296 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number Defendant Date
17CVI02061 TRUE NORTH HOLDINGS INC. ATTN: DAN KEATING 1/3/5000
ROBERT PFEIFFER vs TRUE NORTH HOLDINGS INC. ATTN: DAN KEATING
17CVI02052 KINGS FURNITURE C/O MUSTAFA T. MUSTAFA, STAT AGN 1/3/5000
RODNEY J WOODS SR vs KINGS FURNITURE C/O MUSTAFA T. MUSTAFA, STAT AGN
17CVI02060 JAMES DAMRON 1/3/5000
ROBERT J. PFEIFFER vs JAMES DAMRON
20CVG01050 JAMARR SPEARS, AND ALL OTHERS 9/8/2020
DENIZEN MANAGEMENT FOR: MIAMISBURG GARDENS, LLC vs JAMARR SPEARS, AND ALL OTHERS
20CVG01051 BRANDY PIERCE, AND ALL OTHERS 9/8/2020
ROSS RENTALS vs BRANDY PIERCE, AND ALL OTHERS
20CVH01049 JOHN B BYRGE 9/8/2020
MONTG CNTY ANIMAL RESOURCE vs JOHN B BYRGE
20CVI01053 THOMAS WYATT 9/8/2020
BLAIR REPORTING SERVICES, INC. vs THOMAS WYATT
20CVG01048 BETTY MESAROSH 9/3/2020
JANET DAVIES vs BETTY MESAROSH
20CVG01047 MAILEE M. PATTERSON 9/2/2020
THOMAS REGAN dba T.L.R. PROPERTIES vs MAILEE M. PATTERSON
20CVG01046 DONALD MILLER, AND ALL OTHERS 9/2/2020
JOSEPH MULLINS POA FOR SHIRLEY MULLINS vs DONALD MILLER, AND ALL OTHERS
20CVG01045 RACHONDA HAMPTON, AND ALL OTHERS 9/1/2020
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA INDIAN LOOKOUT APARTMENTS vs RACHONDA HAMPTON, AND ALL OTHERS
20CVI01034 SECOND STREET AUTOMOTIVE JAMES BARTON 9/1/2020
BRAD BOY vs SECOND STREET AUTOMOTIVE JAMES BARTON
20CVG01043 CHRISTOPHER STRIKE, ET AL 8/31/2020
CONREX PROPERTY MGMT, LLC FOR: CONREX RESIDENTIAL SMA vs CHRISTOPHER STRIKE, ET AL
20CVG01044 AIMEE BURBA, AND ALL OTHERS 8/31/2020
VINEBROOK HOMES OH, LLC FOR: NREA BV V LLC vs AIMEE BURBA, AND ALL OTHERS
20CVE01040 TONNI LAFAYETTE 8/31/2020
GUIDEONE MUTUAL INSURANCE ASO FIRST PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH vs TONNI LAFAYETTE
20CVG01041 RICO MARZETTE, AND ALL OTHERS 8/31/2020
MARK GREGOR MGMT vs RICO MARZETTE, AND ALL OTHERS
20CVG01042 LISA SHANK, AND ALL OTHERS 8/31/2020
MARK GREGOR MANAGEMENT vs LISA SHANK, AND ALL OTHERS
20CVG01018 CATHY MUIR, AND ALL OTHERS 8/28/2020
RTB MAPLE RUN LLC dba MAPLE RUN APTS. vs CATHY MUIR, AND ALL OTHERS
20CVG01019 CONNIE POWELL 8/28/2020
RTB MAPLE RUN LLC DBA MAPLE RUN APTS. vs CONNIE POWELL

1, 2, 3 ... 613, 614, 615  Next