Daily Law Journal
10986 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Assignments
Case Number Defendant Date
20CVG01019 CONNIE POWELL TRACY LETOURNEAU MIRANDA DAVIS... 9/24/2020
RTB MAPLE RUN LLC DBA MAPLE RUN APTS. vs CONNIE POWELL TRACY LETOURNEAU MIRAND...
20CVG01021 TYSON SPENCE MORGAN ROACH, AND ALL OTHERS 9/24/2020
MONARCH INVESTMENT & MGMT. GROUP, LLC vs TYSON SPENCE MORGAN ROACH, AND ALL OTH...
20CVG01022 ROBIN ROBINSON, AND ALL OTHERS 9/24/2020
AFFINITY, LLC AGENT FOR: MARK A. HARMON vs ROBIN ROBINSON, AND ALL OTHERS
20CVG00989 JOSH CAPLINGER 9/24/2020
JESSE H BURCHETT vs JOSH CAPLINGER
20CVG00984 JAMES SEARLES AND REGAN GILLUS, AND ALL OTHERS 9/18/2020
K & E PROPERTY MGMT FOR: MURAKAMI J DEY, OWNER vs JAMES SEARLES AND REGAN GILLUS, AND...
20CVG00980 REBECCA DOLIO, AND ALL OTHERS 9/17/2020
MORGAN PROPERTIES DBA HIDDEN LAKES APARTMENTS vs REBECCA DOLIO, AND ALL OTHERS
20CVG00977 KENDRICK CUNNINGHAM, AND ALL OTHERS 9/17/2020
EDWARD ROSE ASSO INC AUTUMN WOODS APARTMENTS vs KENDRICK CUNNINGHAM, AND ALL OTHERS
20CVG00957 ANDREW J. HREN AND IREN A. TERRY AND SONIA MARIE H... 9/17/2020
LORRIS REALTY, LLC dba VIC GREEN REALTY vs ANDREW J. HREN AND IREN A. TERRY AND SONIA...
20CVG00956 JANE DOE AND JOHN DOE, ET AL 9/17/2020
INDEPENDENCE PROPERTY MGMT FOR: DONALD M. JOHNSON, OWNER vs JANE DOE AND JOHN DOE, ET...
20CVG00935 AMANDA HUGES & KARL ABRAMS, ET AL 9/16/2020
O.L. GARRISON vs AMANDA HUGES & KARL ABRAMS, et al
20CVE00681 RONALD E. GEPHART & COMMUNITY INSURANCE CO DBA ANT... 9/16/2020
JAMES D. COOK, III vs RONALD E. GEPHART & COMMUNITY INSURANCE CO DBA ANT...
19CVF04420 JENNIFER RAYMOND 9/16/2020
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs JENNIFER RAYMOND
20CVF02500 SHELLY ANDRASIK 9/16/2020
CBCS vs SHELLY ANDRASIK
19CVF04423 HEATHER D HURLEY 9/16/2020
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC vs HEATHER D HURLEY
20CVF02209 WILLIAM A JOHNSON III 9/16/2020
CITIBANK, N.A. vs WILLIAM A JOHNSON III
20CVG02991 TALBOT D ZIEGLER 9/15/2020
ANGELA K ZIEGLER vs TALBOT D ZIEGLER
19CVF03906 ROGER FLEENOR 9/15/2020
SYNCHRONY BANK vs ROGER FLEENOR
19CVF03576 CARL ROMER II 9/15/2020
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs CARL ROMER II

1, 2, 3 ... 548, 549, 550  Next