9246 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
17CVF01892 | INDIA CLARK | 3/27/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs INDIA CLARK | |||||||||
17CVF01923 | DEEBON Y FROST | 3/27/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELHUIS P.C vs DEEBON Y FROST | |||||||||
17CVF01949 | BRITTANY N JEWELL | 3/27/2018 | |||||||
CBCS vs BRITTANY N JEWELL | |||||||||
17CVF01957 | KENNETH HOWLAND | 3/27/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs KENNETH HOWLAND | |||||||||
17CVF01890 | GLENDA NEWINGHAM | 3/27/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs GLENDA NEWINGHAM | |||||||||
17CVF01289 | DALE BENNETT | 3/26/2018 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs DALE BENNETT | |||||||||
18CVF00230 | STEPHANIE N. BAKER | 3/26/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELHUIS P.C vs STEPHANIE N. BAKER | |||||||||
18CVF00335 | SEAN KELSEY | 3/26/2018 | |||||||
CBCS vs SEAN KELSEY | |||||||||
17CVG01794 | LUCAS VAN AUSDELL | 3/22/2018 | |||||||
KIMBERLY BARNARD HAGERMAN vs LUCAS VAN AUSDELL | |||||||||
18CVF00346 | MISTY LYNCH | 3/22/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELHUIS P.C vs MISTY LYNCH | |||||||||
18CVF00222 | KIMBERLY J. MORANO | 3/22/2018 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs KIMBERLY J. MORANO | |||||||||
17CVF01519 | DAVID S. COURTNEY | 3/21/2018 | |||||||
MANNING LAW FIRM, LLC vs DAVID S. COURTNEY | |||||||||
17CVF01322 | JONATHAN COBB | 3/20/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs JONATHAN COBB | |||||||||
17CVF01428 | TONDIA K. DOSSETT | 3/20/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBI OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs TONDIA K. DOSSETT | |||||||||
17CVF01458 | CARLA D ISAAC | 3/20/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs CARLA D ISAAC | |||||||||
17CVF01750 | WILLIAM M BARTON | 3/20/2018 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O DISCOVER PRODUCTS, INC. vs WILLIAM M BARTON | |||||||||
17CVF01779 | CARLA M ABERNATHY | 3/20/2018 | |||||||
MEMBERS TRUST FEDERAL CREDIT UNION vs CARLA M ABERNATHY | |||||||||
18CVF00149 | KIANA M JAMES | 3/19/2018 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O DISCOVER PRODUCTS, INC. vs KIANA M JAMES | |||||||||
18CVF00244 | RUBY J. BIBLER | 3/19/2018 | |||||||
UNIFUND CCR, LLC vs RUBY J. BIBLER | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 335, 336, 337 ... 461, 462, 463 Next |