Daily Law Journal
7120 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number Defendant Date
CVG2201779 GRIGOREKO, PAVEL 1/3/2023
SL FLATS OWNER, LLC vs GRIGOREKO, PAVEL
CVG2201778 AZBIL, KAMERON 1/3/2023
SL FLATS OWNER, LLC vs AZBIL, KAMERON
CVF2201078 INTEGRITY BUILDING, LLC 12/15/2022
DAYTON SUPERIOR CORPORATION vs INTEGRITY BUILDING, LLC
CVG2201523 WELSH, DANIEL 12/14/2022
ALI PROPERTIES, LLC vs WELSH, DANIEL
CVF2101601 ZOELLER, SCOTT 12/13/2022
STERLING JEWELERS INC vs ZOELLER, SCOTT
CVF2200920 GREENE, NICOLE 12/13/2022
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs GREENE, NICOLE
CVF2200851 GOODE, SUSAN C 12/13/2022
DNF ASSOCIATEES LLC vs GOODE, SUSAN C
CVF2200460 BOHACHE, AARON JR 12/13/2022
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs BOHACHE, AARON JR
CVF2200983 PRICE, TINA 12/13/2022
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs PRICE, TINA
CVF2200895 MELTON, BRIAN 12/13/2022
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs MELTON, BRIAN
CVF2200671 DAVIS, STEPHANIE 12/13/2022
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs DAVIS, STEPHANIE
CVF2201474 HUTCHINS, MICHAEL 12/13/2022
UHG I, LLC vs HUTCHINS, MICHAEL
CVF2200291 CARPENTER, RHONDA 12/13/2022
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs CARPENTER, RHONDA
CVF2200962 SINGH, JASWINDER 12/13/2022
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs SINGH, JASWINDER
CVF2200852 KNOBLOCK, KENNETH 12/13/2022
SYNCHRONY BANK vs KNOBLOCK, KENNETH
CVF2200662 JAMES, MATT 12/13/2022
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs JAMES, MATT
CVF2201140 AZBILL, CHANDRA L 12/13/2022
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES vs AZBILL, CHANDRA L
CVF2201289 BELCHER, CHRISTOPHER 12/12/2022
CITIBANK NA vs BELCHER, CHRISTOPHER
CVF2201508 MOORE, OLIVIA 12/12/2022
LVNV FUNDING, LLC vs MOORE, OLIVIA

Previous  1, 2, 3, 4, 5 ... 354, 355, 356  Next