Daily Law Journal
4874 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number Defendant Date
14CVF01008 VIVIAN HOWARD 7/10/2014
PRIMUS AUTO FINANCIAL SERV vs VIVIAN HOWARD
14CVI00966 TYRICE JONES 7/9/2014
SETTLERS WALK HOME OWNERS ASSOC, C/O TOWNE PROPERTIES vs TYRICE JONES
14CVI00789 DANA TACKETT 7/8/2014
COUNTRY SQUARE PROPERTIES vs DANA TACKETT
14CVI00777 WILLIAM WILSON 7/8/2014
GERALD E GUNNOE vs WILLIAM WILSON
13CVF01177 ANTHONY P DUNLAP 7/7/2014
PMTD REAL ESTATE, LLC vs ANTHONY P DUNLAP
13CVF00729 CHRISTOPHER BRIAN RAUCH 7/7/2014
CENTERVILLE PARK APARTMENTS vs CHRISTOPHER BRIAN RAUCH
14CVF00446 JACK W HEGINBOTHAM 7/7/2014
DISCOVER BANK C/O DB SERVICING CORPORATION vs JACK W HEGINBOTHAM
14CVH00984 MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR 7/2/2014
BENARD L VENAY vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR
14CVF00473 SHAWN E STEVENS 7/1/2014
DISCOVER BANK C/O DB SERVICING CORPORATION vs SHAWN E STEVENS
14CVF00201 CAROLYN BAKER 7/1/2014
OKINUS INC. vs CAROLYN BAKER
14CVF00457 CAROL FRISCH 7/1/2014
MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs CAROL FRISCH
14CVF00707 BRENDA K MCDANIEL 7/1/2014
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs BRENDA K MCDANIEL
14CVF00410 YAHYA O HEFNAWI 7/1/2014
DISCOVER BANK C/O DB SERVICING CORPORATION vs YAHYA O HEFNAWI
14CVF00296 RYAN M LEWIS 6/25/2014
DISCOVER BANK C/O DB SERVICING CORP. vs RYAN M LEWIS
14CVF00068 TONY SHOCKEY 6/25/2014
CAPITAL AUTO CREDIT, LLC vs TONY SHOCKEY
14CVE00286 CORY A HARBARGER 6/25/2014
CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY vs CORY A HARBARGER
14CVF00247 TIMOTHY A DILLON 6/25/2014
ROSS RENTALS DBA WILLOWS APARTMENTS vs TIMOTHY A DILLON
13CVF01677 SHIRLEY ROBINSON 6/25/2014
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs SHIRLEY ROBINSON
14CVF00147 KRISTIN N. LUTHI 6/25/2014
WRIGHT STATE UNIVERSITY C/O STATE OF OHIO COLL. ENFORC. vs KRISTIN N. LUTHI

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 222, 223, 224 ... 242, 243, 244  Next