10122 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
18CVI02762 | ALLIE FRIZZELL | 7/25/2018 | |||||||
EPIC DANCE ACADEMY vs ALLIE FRIZZELL | |||||||||
18CVF02429 | HEATHER VITORRIO | 7/24/2018 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs HEATHER VITORRIO | |||||||||
18CVF02907 | JAMES FULWILER | 7/24/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC 0087618 vs JAMES FULWILER | |||||||||
18CVF02016 | RANDY WHITFIELD | 7/23/2018 | |||||||
ALLY BANK vs RANDY WHITFIELD | |||||||||
18CVF02097 | BARBARA D JACKSON | 7/23/2018 | |||||||
REGENCY FINANCE COMPANY vs BARBARA D JACKSON | |||||||||
18CVF02274 | EVELYN D STEDMAN | 7/23/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs EVELYN D STEDMAN | |||||||||
18CVF02556 | MELISSA FORSYTHE | 7/23/2018 | |||||||
GREENMONT MUTUAL HOUSING vs MELISSA FORSYTHE | |||||||||
18CVF02769 | WILLIAM CRIDER | 7/23/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs WILLIAM CRIDER | |||||||||
18CVF02857 | MARY E FRABOTTA | 7/23/2018 | |||||||
CBCS vs MARY E FRABOTTA | |||||||||
18CVF02896 | TOBIE G MACK | 7/23/2018 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO INC vs TOBIE G MACK | |||||||||
18CVF02750 | ELLIOTT T RONEY | 7/20/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs ELLIOTT T RONEY | |||||||||
17CVF03434 | KATHERINE CATERA | 7/18/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs KATHERINE CATERA | |||||||||
18CVF02493 | JAMES S STUART | 7/18/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE N.A. vs JAMES S STUART | |||||||||
18CVF02756 | RICHARD E HARTMAN | 7/18/2018 | |||||||
BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE vs RICHARD E HARTMAN | |||||||||
18CVF02784 | SPENCER E DUGAN | 7/18/2018 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs SPENCER E DUGAN | |||||||||
18CVE02223 | LINDA PEGRAM | 7/17/2018 | |||||||
CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY vs LINDA PEGRAM | |||||||||
18CVI02864 | TODD A KRISTOFF | 7/17/2018 | |||||||
ERIC WILLIAMS vs TODD A KRISTOFF | |||||||||
18CVF02181 | CARLA ABERNATHY | 7/16/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs CARLA ABERNATHY | |||||||||
18CVF02503 | JOSHUA BENFIELD | 7/16/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs JOSHUA BENFIELD | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 307, 308, 309 ... 505, 506, 507 Next |