Daily Law Journal
9788 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number Defendant Date
18CVF02104 SEAN F KLINE 3/19/2018
VALLONE LAW OFFICES LPA vs SEAN F KLINE
17CVF03679 JOHN BULLOCK 3/19/2018
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs JOHN BULLOCK
17CVF03367 SUSAN STEPHENS 3/19/2018
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs SUSAN STEPHENS
16CVF02448 JAMES BURGERT 3/16/2018
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs JAMES BURGERT
18CVV00002 DON PETIT OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES 3/16/2018
DAWN L MALEPE vs DON PETIT OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES
17CVF03730 DUSTIN WELSH 3/15/2018
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs DUSTIN WELSH
18CVV00014 DON PETIT OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES 3/15/2018
CHARLES LUTE vs DON PETIT OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES
17CVF03278 ANGELA SMITH 3/14/2018
FOX HUNT APARTMENTS vs ANGELA SMITH
17CVF03260 EMILY REO 3/14/2018
FOX HUNT APARTMENTS vs EMILY REO
17CVF03063 JULIA GOFORTH AND LASHEA HOWARD 3/14/2018
FOX HUNT OWNER LLC vs JULIA GOFORTH and LASHEA HOWARD
17CVF03263 CONSTANCE GREATHOUSE AND PERCY ALEXANDER 3/14/2018
FOX HUNT APARTMENTS vs CONSTANCE GREATHOUSE and PERCY ALEXANDER
17CVF03748 JASMINE BRUENS 3/14/2018
VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC vs JASMINE BRUENS
17CVF03089 MATTHEW SHAVER 3/14/2018
COLONY OF KETTERING vs MATTHEW SHAVER
17CVF02024 NICOLE D WATSON 3/14/2018
ALLY FINANCIAL INC. vs NICOLE D WATSON
17CVI03775 JK REAL ESTATE GROUP LLC HEATHER MURPHY-ZAHORA AND... 3/13/2018
DAE K KIM vs JK REAL ESTATE GROUP LLC HEATHER MURPHY-ZAHORA and...
16CVF02546 LAUREN N WENTZEL 3/13/2018
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO INC vs LAUREN N WENTZEL
17CVF03817 RICHARD MUSICK 3/13/2018
HS FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC vs RICHARD MUSICK
17CVF03585 ANTHONY LAMBERT 3/13/2018
CITY OF KETTERING vs ANTHONY LAMBERT
17CVF03852 HARVEY DANIEL 3/13/2018
CITY OF KETTERING vs HARVEY DANIEL

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 443, 444, 445 ... 488, 489, 490  Next