Case Information
5/3/2024
24CVG01292
Dayton Municipal
Independence Property Management Co. L L C
Lamica Cartwright And All Occupants
Civil Status Hearing - Magistrate
William L Willis of Willis Law Firm Llc
Docket History
4/23/2024
Judgment: Magistrate's Order
4/9/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre
4/9/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre
4/5/2024
Eviction Hearing
3/1/2024
Forcible Entry & Detainer