Daily Law Journal

Case Information

3/3/2025
25CVH00075
Dayton Municipal

Sawmill Road Management
Marcel Coaston
Judgment: Consent Judgment

Michael J Cassone of Cassone Law Offices, Llc

Docket History

2/24/2025
Escrow Hearing

1/29/2025
Answer

1/27/2025
Escrow Hearing

1/27/2025
Motion To Release Funds

1/7/2025
Rent Escrow