Daily Law Journal

Case Information

3/14/2025
25CVG00778
Dayton Municipal

Janis Bryant Hayes
Kalena Daniel And All Others
Judgment: Entry And Order

Laurence A Lasky of Lasky & Scharrer

Docket History

3/10/2025
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

3/10/2025
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

3/6/2025
Eviction Hearing - Lasky

3/6/2025
Motion For Continuance

2/27/2025
Eviction Hearing - Lasky

2/5/2025
Forcible Entry & Detainer