Daily Law Journal

Case Information

3/11/2025
25CVG00664
Dayton Municipal

Bella Realty Group Property Management
Donasia Morris And All Others
Judgment: Entry And Order

Joseph C Lucas of Law Office Of Joseph C. Lucas, Llc

Docket History

3/7/2025
Motion To Stay

3/3/2025
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Premises

3/3/2025
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Premises

2/21/2025
Eviction Hearing - Lucas

2/20/2025
Motion For Continuance

1/30/2025
Forcible Entry & Detainer