Daily Law Journal

Case Information

2/21/2025
24CVI06461
Dayton Municipal

Curtis E. Stargell SR
Cathy Clancy, et al
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision


Docket History

2/21/2025
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

2/19/2025
Small Claims Hearing

2/5/2025
Small Claims Hearing

1/30/2025
Motion For Continuance

1/8/2025
Small Claims Hearing

1/7/2025
Motion For Continuance

12/11/2024
Small Claims Hearing

11/8/2024
Small Claims