Daily Law Journal

Case Information

4/17/2025
24CVI06398
Dayton Municipal

Michaela Carter, et al
Bridgestream Property, et al
Pre Trial/ Telephone Conference

Mia Wortham Spells

Docket History

4/3/2025
Motion To Withdraw As Counsel

2/6/2025
Pre Trial/ Telephone Conference

2/4/2025
Motion For Continuance

1/30/2025
Motion For Leave To File An Amended Complaint

12/11/2024
Small Claims Hearing

12/9/2024
Answer And Counterclaim

11/5/2024
Small Claims