Daily Law Journal

Case Information

2/25/2025
24CVI04878
Dayton Municipal

Willie Hutson, et al
Ronald Smith
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision


Docket History

2/25/2025
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

2/24/2025
Conversion Hearing

2/6/2025
Conversion Hearing Request

10/30/2024
Small Claims Hearing

10/30/2024
Judgment: Mediated Agreement

9/25/2024
Small Claims Hearing

8/19/2024
Small Claims