Daily Law Journal

Case Information

3/11/2024
24CVH00672
Dayton Municipal

Kevin Hutchinson
Rosalynn Ford
Escrow Hearing


Docket History

3/7/2024
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

3/7/2024
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

3/6/2024
Motion For Continuance

3/6/2024
Answer

2/26/2024
Escrow Hearing

2/1/2024
Rent Escrow