Daily Law Journal

Case Information

7/23/2024
24CVH00648
Dayton Municipal

Paul Teixeira
Shamekia Martin
Motion Hearing

Michael T Columbus

Docket History

7/9/2024
Motion Hearing

7/8/2024
Joint Motion For Continuance

6/3/2024
Motion To Dismiss

3/27/2024
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting The Magistrates Decision On Escrowed Funds.

3/27/2024
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting The Magistrates Decision On Escrowed Funds.

3/25/2024
Civil Status Hearing - Magistrate

3/6/2024
Judgment: Magistrate's Decision

2/26/2024
Escrow Hearing

1/31/2024
Rent Escrow