Daily Law Journal

Case Information

4/22/2024
24CVH00464
Dayton Municipal

Real Property Mang
Angila Thompkins
Civil Status Hearing - Magistrate


Docket History

3/27/2024
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting The Magistrates Decision On Escrowed Funds.

3/27/2024
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting The Magistrates Decision On Escrowed Funds.

3/25/2024
Civil Status Hearing - Magistrate

3/7/2024
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

3/7/2024
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

2/26/2024
Escrow Hearing

2/12/2024
Escrow Hearing

1/23/2024
Rent Escrow