Daily Law Journal

Case Information

3/3/2025
24CVG07389
Dayton Municipal

American Ave. I Pm
Chelsea Butler And All Other Occupants
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

D Andrew Heyman of Heyman Law Llc

Docket History

3/3/2025
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

2/28/2025
Eviction Hearing

2/7/2025
Eviction Hearing

1/24/2025
Eviction Hearing

12/27/2024
Forcible Entry & Detainer