Daily Law Journal

Case Information

3/21/2025
24CVG06410
Dayton Municipal

Hutchins Development Corp.
Stephen Michael Mobley And All Others
Judgment for the Defendant: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

Sean S Stone of Ruffolo, Stone & Stone

Docket History

3/21/2025
Judgment for the Defendant: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

2/21/2025
Eviction Hearing

1/31/2025
Eviction Hearing

1/30/2025
Motion For Continuance

12/23/2024
Motion For Continuance

12/6/2024
Eviction Hearing

12/6/2024
Motion For Summary Judgment

11/7/2024
Forcible Entry & Detainer