Daily Law Journal

Case Information

3/21/2025
24CVG03991
Dayton Municipal

Ohda Sunny Mhp, Llc
Harold Stuart And All Others
Auction

Kyle C Duwel of Duwel Law

Docket History

3/7/2025
Auction

3/3/2025
Judgment: Magistrate's Decision

8/20/2024
Judgment: Magistrate's Order

8/6/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

8/6/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

8/2/2024
Eviction Hearing

7/2/2024
Forcible Entry & Detainer