Daily Law Journal

Case Information

3/20/2025
24CVG02078
Dayton Municipal

Kmg Prestige Inc, Dba Summit Square Apartments
Jashawna Smith And All Occupants
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision Granting Sealing Of T

Clint B Charnes of Willis Law Firm Llc

Docket History

3/20/2025
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision Granting Sealing Of T

3/18/2025
Eviction Sealing Of Record

3/4/2025
Eviction Sealing Of Record

4/29/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

4/29/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

4/26/2024
Eviction Hearing

4/2/2024
Forcible Entry & Detainer