Daily Law Journal

Case Information

4/2/2025
24CVG02037
Dayton Municipal

Masher Propertes, LLC
Jade Johnson And All Occupants, et al
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

Joseph C Lucas of Law Office Of Joseph C. Lucas, Llc

Docket History

4/2/2025
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

3/24/2025
Civil Trial

2/28/2025
Judgment: Entry And Order

2/24/2025
Pre Trial/ Telephone Conference

1/14/2025
Judgment: Magistrate's Order

11/18/2024
Judgment: Entry And Order

11/18/2024
Pre Trial/ Telephone Conference

10/21/2024
Final Pre Trial

9/23/2024
Pre Trial/ Telephone Conference

8/5/2024
Pre Trial/ Telephone Conference

7/9/2024
Pre Trial/ Telephone Conference

6/3/2024
Pre Trial/ Telephone Conference

5/28/2024
Answer To Counterclaim

4/29/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

4/29/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

4/26/2024
Eviction Hearing - Lucas

4/1/2024
Forcible Entry & Detainer