Daily Law Journal

Case Information

9/11/2024
24CVG01133
Dayton Municipal

Greater Dayton Premier Management
Carolyn Hunter And All Occupants
Motion To Lift Stay

Christopher C Green

Docket History

7/8/2024
Motion To Lift Stay

4/12/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Agreed Entry

4/4/2024
Motion To Stay Writ Of Restitution

3/22/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

3/22/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

3/21/2024
Eviction Hearing - Gdpm

2/23/2024
Forcible Entry & Detainer