Daily Law Journal

Case Information

4/23/2025
24CVG01127
Dayton Municipal

Greater Dayton Premier Management
Justin Fanty And All Occupants
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision Granting Sealing Of T

Christopher C Green

Docket History

4/23/2025
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision Granting Sealing Of T

3/21/2024
Eviction Hearing - Gdpm

3/19/2024
Motion To Dismiss

3/14/2024
Motion For Continuance

2/23/2024
Forcible Entry & Detainer