Daily Law Journal

Case Information

5/1/2024
24CVG00810
Dayton Municipal

Gary McCall
John Doe And All Other Occupants
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

Joseph C Lucas of Law Office Of Joseph C. Lucas, Llc

Docket History

5/1/2024
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

3/18/2024
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

3/18/2024
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

3/4/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

3/4/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

3/1/2024
Eviction Hearing - Lucas

2/8/2024
Forcible Entry & Detainer