Daily Law Journal

Case Information

1/14/2025
24CVG00767
Dayton Municipal

David Vloedman
Shawn M Hill
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Default Judgment

Dina M Cary of Coolidge Wall Co., L.P.A

Docket History

12/19/2024
Motion For Default Judgment

6/18/2024
Motion For Default Judgment

3/11/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

3/11/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

3/8/2024
Eviction Hearing

2/6/2024
Forcible Entry & Detainer