Daily Law Journal

Case Information

4/4/2024
24CVG00675
Dayton Municipal

Gem City Property Managment, L L C
Keith Jones and all other occupants, et al
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Dismissal

David L Layman

Docket History

4/4/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Dismissal

3/22/2024
Eviction Hearing - Layman

3/22/2024
Motion To Dismiss

3/8/2024
Eviction Hearing - Layman

2/23/2024
Eviction Hearing - Layman

2/2/2024
Forcible Entry & Detainer