Daily Law Journal

Case Information

8/28/2024
24CVG00664
Dayton Municipal

Flourish Real Estate and property Management
Shaquayia Crawley and all other occupants
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Default Judgment

Jennifer S Bock of Bock Legal Servies, Llc

Docket History

8/16/2024
Motion For Default Judgment

2/26/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

2/26/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

2/23/2024
Eviction Hearing

2/1/2024
Forcible Entry & Detainer