Daily Law Journal

Case Information

3/14/2024
24CVG00299
Dayton Municipal

Sfr3, Llc
Julus Jerome Hagans
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Dismissal

D Andrew Heyman of Heyman Law, Llc

Docket History

3/14/2024
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Dismissal

3/8/2024
Eviction Hearing

2/23/2024
Eviction Hearing

2/9/2024
Eviction Hearing

1/17/2024
Forcible Entry & Detainer