Daily Law Journal

Case Information

2/12/2024
24CVG00288
Dayton Municipal

Calvin Rutledge Jr as Trustee of the Calvin David Rutledge Jr Living Trust
Greg Andrew and all others, et al
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

Laurence A Lasky of Lasky & Scharrer

Docket History

2/12/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

2/8/2024
Eviction Hearing - Lasky

2/7/2024
Judgment: Magistrate's Order

1/25/2024
Request For A Emergency Hearing

1/17/2024
Forcible Entry & Detainer