Daily Law Journal

Case Information

2/29/2024
24CVG00280
Dayton Municipal

Greater Dayton Premier Management
Bryanna Curry and all other occupants
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Agreed Entry Of Settlement

Christopher C Green

Docket History

2/27/2024
Motion For Stay Of Restitution

2/16/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

2/16/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

2/15/2024
Eviction Hearing - Gdpm

1/17/2024
Forcible Entry & Detainer