Daily Law Journal

Case Information

2/23/2024
24CVG00279
Dayton Municipal

Greater Dayton Premier Management
Daneilia Thorne and all other occupants
Motion To Dismiss

Christopher C Green

Docket History

2/22/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Agreed Entry Of Settlement

2/15/2024
Eviction Hearing - Gdpm

2/2/2024
Motion For Continuance

1/17/2024
Forcible Entry & Detainer